Global Patent Index - EP 0846806 B1

EP 0846806 B1 2001-12-19 - Apparatus for applying pasty bituminous materials in stripform

Title (en)

Apparatus for applying pasty bituminous materials in stripform

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen eines pastenförmigen Bitumenmaterials in Streifenform

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer des matériaux bitumineux pâteux en forme de bande

Publication

EP 0846806 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118511 A

Priority

DE 29621323 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846806A1] The machine has a chassis (1) with a bitumen container (11), which is connected to a material extraction line (17,18). The free end of the line carries a nozzle, located on a carrier (4). This is movable and adjustable relative to the chassis. The line is connected to a driven dosing device, eg. a gear pump (15). The pump is preferably located under the container, and its intake (14) is connected to the container outlet (12). The container is funnel-shaped, and connected to a vibrator. A central engine (10), e.g. reciprocating piston engine, on the chassis drives pump and chassis, and also acts as vibrator for the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/0973 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29621323 U1 19970206; AT 211203 T 20020115; EP 0846806 A1 19980610; EP 0846806 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041024

2003-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705883 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211203 T 20020115

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000630

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI NL

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980507

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI