Global patent index - EP 0846821 A3

EP 0846821 A3 2000-11-29 - Device for checking the user authorization of an access control system

Title (en)

Device for checking the user authorization of an access control system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Prüfung der Nutzungsberechtigung für Zugangskontrolleinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour vérifier l'autorisation de contrôle d'accès

Publication

EP 0846821 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121006 A

Priority

DE 19650020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846821A2] The device has an access-side control device with a storage region for a secret code, a user-side key device which contains a transponder with a storage region for a secret code and something in the control unit to establish the necessary authority for the release of the access device. Information sent out from the transponder, keyed with the secret code is compared with default information stored by the secret code in the control device and access release occurs only when there is agreement. The transponder of the key device contains a further storage region in which car-specific release information of the key device can be filed at the control unit to allow testing by the control unit of whether the key device possesses the authority to be instructed at the control unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; B60R 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00857 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00873 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846821 A2 19980610; EP 0846821 A3 20001129; EP 0846821 B1 20050119

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140418

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140409

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140409

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140409

2014-04-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110504

2010-12-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59712170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030516

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI