Global patent index - EP 0846912 A3

EP 0846912 A3 2000-07-26 - Vehicle light.

Title (en)

Vehicle light.

Title (de)

Fahrzeugleuchte

Title (fr)

Phare

Publication

EP 0846912 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97890211 A

Priority

AT 212796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846912A2] The lamp has a free-surface reflector. Grooves in this surface are in a plane at right angles to the horizontal plane through the optical axis. The planes of the grooves run at different angles relative to the vertical plane through the optical axis, the range being between -20 degrees and +20 degrees . The enclosed angle by the plane of the grooves with the vertical plane through the optical axis is in the region of 50 degrees . For each groove, the projections of the end of the bulb facing the reflector over groove regions lying above the horizontal plane through the optical axis lie higher on a projection surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1376 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846912 A2 19980610; EP 0846912 A3 20000726; EP 0846912 B1 20030813; AT 404396 B 19981125; AT A212796 A 19980315; DE 59710572 D1 20030918

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-02-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-11-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59710572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 7/04 B

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI