Global Patent Index - EP 0846927 B1

EP 0846927 B1 2000-04-19 - Thermal type expansion valve

Title (en)

Thermal type expansion valve

Title (de)

Thermisches Entspannungsventil

Title (fr)

Soupape de détente thermique

Publication

EP 0846927 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119717 A

Priority

  • EP 96119717 A
  • JP 12243596 A
  • JP 20175495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0846927A1] An expansion valve (40) includes a valve body (41), an adjusting mechanism (46) for adjusting a flow rate of a refrigerant supplied to an evaporator (5) and a control mechanism (54) for controlling the adjusting mechanism (46) in accordance with a temperature of the refrigerant supplied to a compressor (1) from the evaporator (5). The body (41) has a first passage (42) for introducing the refrigerant to the body (41), a second passage (43) for supplying the refrigerant from the first passage (42) to the evaporator (5) and a third passage (44) for transferring the refrigerant to the compressor (1) from the evaporator (5). The adjusting mechanism (46) has a restriction (47a) for connecting the first passage (42) with the second passage (43) and a valve member (48) for adjusting a degree of the restriction (47a). The control mechanism (54) has a heat sensitive chamber (61) filled with the gas in a sealing manner and a diaphragm (57) movable in accordance with pressure in the sensitive chamber (61). A transmitting member (65) transmits the temperature of the refrigerant flowing in the third passage (44) to the gas in the sensitive chamber (61) and the movement of the diaphragm (57) to the valve member (48). The body (41) is made of a synthetic resin. A metal member (47) is disposed in the body (41) between the first passage (42) and the second passage (43). The metal member (47) has the restriction (47a) and a valve seat (50) for contacting the valve member (48). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/68 (2006.01); F25B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/062 (2013.01); F25B 2341/0683 (2013.01); F25B 2500/05 (2013.01); F25B 2500/221 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0736737 A2 19961009 - FUJI KOKI MFG [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0846927 A1 19980610; EP 0846927 B1 20000419; JP 3130246 B2 20010131; JP H0989154 A 19970331

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101209

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607846

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101209

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607846 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI