Global Patent Index - EP 0847146 A3

EP 0847146 A3 2000-08-30 - A transmission power control apparatus for a mobile communication system

Title (en)

A transmission power control apparatus for a mobile communication system

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Senderleistung in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de puissance d'emission dans un système de communications mobile

Publication

EP 0847146 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97120739 A

Priority

JP 32567996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847146A2] A transmission power control apparatus capable of reducing interference, in a mobile communication adopting the CDMA system, with other communications by decreasing transmission power in one direction of channel taking communication quality of other channel of direction into account is provided. A reverse channel error rate judgment section for judging a communication quality of the reverse channel by a reverse channel frame error rate detected and a forward channel error rate judgment section for judging a communication quality of the forward channel by a forward channel frame error rate reported by a mobile terminal are provided in the radio base station. The forward channel error rate judgment section, when detected, reports the state of communication degradation of own direction of channel to the reverse channel error rate judgment section which, in turn, controls to instruct the mobile terminal to decrease transmission power of the reverse channel. When communication degradation is detected by the reverse channel error rate judgment section, the state is reported to the forward channel error rate judgment section to control to decrease transmission power of the forward channel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/005; H04B 7/216

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/20 (2013.01); H04W 52/281 (2013.01); H04W 52/282 (2013.01); H04W 52/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847146 A2 19980610; EP 0847146 A3 20000830; CN 1088966 C 20020807; CN 1185706 A 19980624; JP 3039402 B2 20000508; JP H10173593 A 19980626; US 6035210 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 7/005 A

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-06-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI