Global patent index - EP 0847373 B1

EP 0847373 B1 2001-04-25 - DEVICE FOR RE-SUCTION OF WATER FROM AN OUTLET PIPE IN CONNECTION WITH A WATER PURIFIER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR RE-SUCTION OF WATER FROM AN OUTLET PIPE IN CONNECTION WITH A WATER PURIFIER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM RÜCKSAUGEN VON WASSER AUS EINEM AUSLASSROHR IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM WASSERREINIGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REASPIRATION DE L'EAU DE LA CONDUITE DE SORTIE D'UN PURIFICATEUR D'EAU

Publication

EP 0847373 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925226 A

Priority

  • SE 9600954 W
  • SE 9502720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705063A1] The present invention relates to a device for re-suction of water from an outlet pipe (18) of a water purifier (10), pressurized water being fed to said purifier, said device according to the present invention including an ejector (26) arranged to cooperate with an outlet conduit (14) for the water, said cooperation takes place before the outlet conduit (14) transfers into the outlet pipe (18). In water purifiers having a simple design the water is forced through the filters by the pressure in the water distribution system. The problem in connection therewith is that the water continues to drip even after the pressure in the water distribution system has been shut off. According to the present invention this problem is solved by having an ejector (26) to cooperate with a hose/conduit (20) having one end open towards the atmosphere, said hose/conduit serving as a reservoir of a certain volume that is used for re-suction of the water that is present in the outlet pipe (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 1/00; B01D 24/42; B67D 1/08; E03B 7/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2013.01); B67D 2210/0001 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 1969259 U 19670928 - STIEBEL WERKE GMBH & CO DR [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705063 A1 19970213; BR 9609957 A 19990202; CN 1191522 A 19980826; DE 69612620 D1 20010531; DE 69612620 T2 20011018; EP 0847373 A1 19980617; EP 0847373 B1 20010425; IL 118826 A 20000229; IL 118826 D0 19961031; MX 9800702 A 19980430; SE 9502720 D0 19950728; SE 9502720 L 19970129

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030712

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030712

2003-06-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-07-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-07-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-31

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2001-04-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR RE-SUCTION OF WATER FROM AN OUTLET PIPE IN CONNECTION WITH A WATER PURIFIER

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990910

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971122

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT SE