Global Patent Index - EP 0847462 B1

EP 0847462 B1 2001-03-14 - NOVEL DRAINING WALL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND ELEMENT IMPLEMENTATED THEREBY

Title (en)

NOVEL DRAINING WALL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND ELEMENT IMPLEMENTATED THEREBY

Title (de)

DRÄNAGEWAND, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN UND ELEMENT HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE PAROI DRAINANTE, PROCEDE POUR SA REALISATION ET ELEMENT MIS EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 0847462 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930589 A

Priority

  • FR 9701136 W
  • FR 9607945 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749871A1] The invention discloses a draining wall consisting of a plurality of elementary panels (P) filled with a filtering material (10), characterised in that the said panels are separated from one another by intermediate elements (J) and in that an element (2) connecting each pair of adjacent panels is embedded in the lower part of each intermediate element. The invention also discloses a method and an element for its implementation. The invention is particularly useful for landslide areas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/10; E02B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 9/06 (2006.01); E02B 11/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/10 (2006.01); E02D 5/20 (2006.01); E02F 5/10 (2006.01); F16L 1/038 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/00 (2013.01); E02D 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9749871 A1 19971231; AT 199754 T 20010315; AU 3448597 A 19980114; AU 716745 B2 20000302; DE 69704253 D1 20010419; EP 0847462 A1 19980617; EP 0847462 B1 20010314; ES 2157585 T3 20010816; FR 2750442 A1 19980102; FR 2750442 B1 19980911; HK 1011553 A1 20011102; ID 18736 A 19980507; JP 3192661 B2 20010730; JP H11513086 A 19991109; MY 122014 A 20060331; NO 314094 B1 20030127; NO 980825 A 19980424; NO 980825 D0 19980226; NZ 329762 A 19990830; US 6082928 A 20000704; ZA 9705612 B 19980123

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140626

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140625

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140625

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLETANCHE BACHY FRANCE

- Effective date: 20130630

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157585 T3

2001-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-06-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704253 20010419

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199754 T 20010315

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLETANCHE BACHY FRANCE

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980128

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR LI NL SE