Global Patent Index - EP 0847650 A4

EP 0847650 A4 2000-01-05 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BOUND-BASED ADAPTIVE ENTROPY ENCODING/DECODING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BOUND-BASED ADAPTIVE ENTROPY ENCODING/DECODING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GRENZWERTBASIERTEN ADAPTIVEN ENTROPIECODIERUNG UND -DECODIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET DECODAGE ENTROPIQUE ADAPTATIF A PRINCIPE DE BORNAGE

Publication

EP 0847650 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97931485 A

Priority

  • US 9711343 W
  • US 67760396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800977A1] The present invention provides an apparatus and method for adaptive encoding/decoding in a multimedia compression system. For encoding, the steps include: A) step (102) for parsing a predetermined number of quantized transform coefficients into a plurality of coefficients groups in a predetermined scanning order and converting the coefficient groups into a plurality of parameter sets according to a predetermined scheme and storing the parameter sets wherein, where a last coefficient group comprises all zero quantized transform coefficients, the last coefficent group is discarded; B) step (104) for sending, in accordance with a signal from the encoder controller, a current parameter set of the plurality of parameter sets in the predetermined scanning order; C) step (106) for adaptively selecting a current entropy encoder based on a state parameter of a last parameter set; and D) step (108) for enconding a current parameter set to provide entropy-encoded information bits. Decoding is accomplished in a fashion that mirrors the encoding method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/26; H04N 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/18 (2014.11); H04N 19/126 (2014.11); H04N 19/132 (2014.11); H04N 19/136 (2014.11); H04N 19/124 (2014.11); H04N 19/13 (2014.11); H04N 19/146 (2014.11); H04N 19/60 (2014.11); H04N 19/91 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800977 A1 19980108; CN 1097957 C 20030101; CN 1197578 A 19981028; EP 0847650 A1 19980617; EP 0847650 A4 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 7/26 A, 7H 04N 7/30 B, 7G 06T 9/00 B

2000-01-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980708

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB