Global Patent Index - EP 0847681 B1

EP 0847681 B1 2001-12-05 - STRIKING CIRCUIT FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

STRIKING CIRCUIT FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

ZÜNDSCHALTUNG FÜR EINE HOCHDRUCK-GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT D'AMORCAGE POUR LAMPE A DECHARGE EN ATMOSPHERE GAZEUSE HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0847681 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927655 A

Priority

  • DE 19531622 A
  • EP 9603397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19531622A1] A striking circuit for a high-pressure discharge lamp (4) connected via a choke (3) to an a.c. voltage source and with a pulse transformer (5), the secondary winding (6) of which is fitted between the choke (3) and the lamp (4) and the primary winding (8) of which, with a switching component (9), forms a series circuit which in turn is connected in parallel to a pulse capacitor, in which a controllable switch (10) is connected in series with the parallel circuit of the pulse capacitor (7) on the one hand and the primary winding (8) and the switching component (9) on the other, said switch (10) being actuated on the occurrence of a striking pulse for the high-pressure gas discharge lamp (4) in such a way that the settlement of the oscillating circuit consisting of the pulse capacitor (7), the primary winding (8) and the switching component (9) or the rapid recovery of the switching component (9) is ensured. It is thus possible to obtain a short striking pulse sequence with a large number of striking pulses, thus ensuring that the lamp is reliably struck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531622 A1 19970306; DE 19531622 B4 20110113; AT 210364 T 20011215; AU 6741196 A 19970319; AU 698825 B2 19981105; EP 0847681 A1 19980617; EP 0847681 B1 20011205; ES 2169252 T3 20020701; NO 323736 B1 20070702; NO 980865 A 19980227; NO 980865 D0 19980227; NZ 315658 A 19990528; TR 199800235 T2 19980821; WO 9708921 A1 19970306; ZA 9606972 B 19970919

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-08-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160731

2016-08-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608386

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150901

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090802

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080820

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169252 T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608386 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210364 T 20011215

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001006

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE