Global patent index - EP 0847711 A3

EP 0847711 A3 2000-06-28 - Protective cover for scalp and hair root

Title (en)

Protective cover for scalp and hair root

Title (de)

Schutzhülle für Kopfhaut und Haarwurzeln

Title (fr)

Housse protectrice pour cuir chevelu et racine du cheveu

Publication

EP 0847711 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121454 A

Priority

  • DE 29621606 U
  • DE 19706084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847711A2] The cylindrical protective sheath (20) has compartments each of which encloses at least one hair-curler (11). The sheath can be flapped up longitudinally and has one inner compartment (2). An opening (1) in the sheath has a flap for permanent-wave lotion. A longitudinal edge in the outer surface of the sheath supports a seal and or is in the form of discs or compartments. The sheath is closed by end-caps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 19/00; A45D 2/00; A45D 6/18; A45D 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 6/18 (2006.01); A45D 7/04 (2006.01); A45D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 7/04 (2013.01); A45D 6/18 (2013.01); A45D 19/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847711 A2 19980617; EP 0847711 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-04-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45D 19/00 A, 7A 45D 6/18 B, 7A 45D 19/18 B, 7A 45D 2/00 B

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI