Global Patent Index - EP 0847712 B1

EP 0847712 B1 2001-05-30 - Reptacle for cosmetic products and others

Title (en)

Reptacle for cosmetic products and others

Title (de)

Behälter für kosmetisches Produkt oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Réceptacle pour produits cosmétiques ou autres

Publication

EP 0847712 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402674 A

Priority

  • FR 9613806 A
  • US 96858097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847712A1] The container comprises a shell (1) which forms the base and a shell (2) which forms the cover. The shells are linked together by at least one elastic leaf (6) whose end is fixed solidly with one of the shells and whose other end is fixed articulately (8) to the interior of the other shell near the joint (3) plane of the two shells. The elastic joint may be provided on the cover, parallel to the joint plane of the two shells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/02; A45C 13/00; B65D 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/005 (2013.01); A45D 34/02 (2013.01); B65D 43/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2755591 A1 19980515; FR 2755591 B1 19990122; DE 69705014 D1 20010705; DE 69705014 T2 20020124; EP 0847712 A1 19980617; EP 0847712 B1 20010530; ES 2163111 T3 20020116; US 5901715 A 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101108

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101107

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101107

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69705014

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69705014

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101107

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163111 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69705014 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000811

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980910

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI