Global Patent Index - EP 0847799 B1

EP 0847799 B1 2000-09-20 - Impeller

Title (en)

Impeller

Title (de)

Rührorgan

Title (fr)

Agitateur

Publication

EP 0847799 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121866 A

Priority

DE 29621683 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5904423A] A stirring element (10), especially a gasing stirring element for stirring liquids and introducing a gas, preferably air, to the liquids. The stirring element has a hub (12) for attachment to a stirring shaft and a support disk (14) joined to the hub (12), a plurality of stirring blades (16) being attached to a peripheral edge of the support disk (14). To achieve a low output power coefficient, each stirring blade (16) is made of a wedge-shape that is directed in the direction of rotary motion of the stirring element (10). Preferably, radially inner end sections (22, 24) of two sides (18, 20) of the stirring blade (16) are angled relative to sides (18, 20) outwardly with reference to the direction of rotary motion of the stirring element (10). The stirring element (10) simplifies gas feed and prevents clogs. By providing the support disk (14) with a conical shape having a ring of teeth (26) on its outer edge, a uniform distribution and good dispersion of the gas bubbles is obtainable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00466 (2013.01); B01F 3/04531 (2013.01); B01F 13/1033 (2013.01); B01F 7/00291 (2013.01); B01F 7/0045 (2013.01); B01F 2003/04673 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29621683 U1 19970213; AT 196432 T 20001015; DK 0847799 T3 20010129; EP 0847799 A1 19980617; EP 0847799 B1 20000920; US 5904423 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171210

2018-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 196432 T

- Effective date: 20171211

2018-01-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171210

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-18 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20171211

2017-12-13 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171210

2017-12-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702379

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: POSTFACH, 8058 ZUERICH-FLUGHAFEN (CH)

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702379

- Representative's name: DAUB, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING., DE

2014-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, CH

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702379 20001026

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE GEORG ROEMPLER UND ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196432 T 20001015

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981215

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI