Global Patent Index - EP 0847813 B1

EP 0847813 B1 2003-06-04 - Device and method for cleaning containers such as for example agricultural crates

Title (en)

Device and method for cleaning containers such as for example agricultural crates

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reinigen von Behältern wie zum Beispiel landwirtschaftliche Kasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour nettoyer des conteneurs tels que des caisses agricoles par exemple

Publication

EP 0847813 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97203932 A

Priority

NL 1004784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847813A1] Method for cleaning agricultural crates. A crate (3) is clamped in a clamping device (14), lifted up and turned upside down, both the inner surfaces and the outer surfaces of the crate (3) being sprayed down simultaneously. Device (1) for cleaning agricultural crates (3), comprising a frame (19) in which a crate (3) can be placed, which frame (19) is provided with clamping means (14) for holding a crate (3), which clamping means (14) can rotate, with the aid of rotation means, about a horizontal rotation shaft (18) which can be displaced vertically with the aid of lifting means (17). The device (1) furthermore comprises means (25,36) for spraying down the walls of the crate (3), comprising a feed line for the supply of water, which feed line is connected to a line which is provided at the end with spray openings. The line is attached to the frame and can be placed in a crate (3) to be cleaned. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0861 (2013.01); B08B 9/0826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847813 A1 19980617; EP 0847813 B1 20030604; DE 69722569 D1 20030710; DE 69722569 T2 20040429; NL 1004784 C2 19980617

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NAAKTGEBOREN BASTIAAN

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071217

2008-09-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-01 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722569 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001128

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980720

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI