Global Patent Index - EP 0847818 B1

EP 0847818 B1 2002-09-04 - Transfer press

Title (en)

Transfer press

Title (de)

Transferpresse

Title (fr)

Presse de transfert

Publication

EP 0847818 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116885 A

Priority

DE 19651934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847818A1] The transfer press or press line has several tool stages arranged one after another, with an intermediate depositing stage with equipment (5) for depositing and/or altering the position of the workpiece. The press is improved by the fact that the equipment (5) can deal with a single large sheet-metal workpiece or at least with two small workpieces. The equipment incorporates means acting jointly to alter the position of a large workpiece or, alternatively, acting independently of one another to alter the position of several smaller workpieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847818 A1 19980617; EP 0847818 B1 20020904; DE 19651934 A1 19980618; ES 2183064 T3 20030316

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708118

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183064 T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708118 20021010

2002-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010905

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980826

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI