Global Patent Index - EP 0847836 B1

EP 0847836 B1 2001-02-28 - Percussive tool with fluid pressure drive

Title (en)

Percussive tool with fluid pressure drive

Title (de)

Fluidbetriebenes Schlagwerk

Title (fr)

Appareil à percussion mû par un fluide sous pression

Publication

EP 0847836 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121702 A

Priority

DE 19652079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847836A1] The mechanism comprises a percussion piston which is movable in an operating cylinder. A control (8) has a distributing regulator (9) movable in relation to a housing. The percussion piston has two piston surfaces (A1,A2) of different surface areas the smaller of which is connected to a pressure pipe (7) and the larger connected alternately to the pressure pipe and discharge pipe (12). The distributing regulator has a control surface (SF) temporarily connected to a pressure-free return-flow pipe (18) or to the pressure pipe, by means of a peripheral groove (3c) between the piston surfaces. The distributing regulator forms a sleeve-type switch element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/12; B25D 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/12 (2006.01); B25D 9/14 (2006.01); E21B 1/00 (2006.01); E21B 1/26 (2006.01); E21B 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/12 (2013.01); B25D 9/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847836 A1 19980617; EP 0847836 B1 20010228; DE 19652079 A1 19980618; DE 19652079 C2 19990225; ES 2154443 T3 20010401; JP 3908362 B2 20070425; JP H10184262 A 19980714; US 5960893 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154443 T3

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-08-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000327

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRUPP BERCO BAUTECHNIK GMBH

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI