Global patent index - EP 0847839 A3

EP 0847839 A3 2000-04-05 - Frame saw with additional set of saw blades

Title (en)

Frame saw with additional set of saw blades

Title (de)

Gattersäge mit Zusatz-Sägenpaketen

Title (fr)

Scoe à cadre à ensemble de lames de scie additionnel

Publication

EP 0847839 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121796 A

Priority

DE 19651654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847839A2] A saw frame (3) of a gang saw with variable saw cut width moves up and down in a machine frame (2) and mounts two saw packets (4, 4 '), each with a number of saw blades running vertically. Between the main saw packets is at least one additional saw packet (55, 55 ') which is mounted on the saw frame and can be detachably coupled to one of the main saw packets so that it can be displaced for adjustment by an adjustment drive (6, 6 ') operating on the main saw packets. Preferably, the additional saw packet is mounted own guide as the associated main saw packet and can be retained in a target position transfer to the direction in which the material to be sawn passes through.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847839 A2 19980617; EP 0847839 A3 20000405; DE 19651654 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI