Global Patent Index - EP 0847857 B1

EP 0847857 B1 2001-05-30 - Adjustment device for a cross bar placed in front of a cylinder for a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Adjustment device for a cross bar placed in front of a cylinder for a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Justiereinrichtung einer vor einem Zylinder einer Rotationsdruckmaschine angeordneten Traverse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ajustement d'une traverse placée devant un cylindre d'une machine à imprimer rotative

Publication

EP 0847857 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121273 A

Priority

DE 19651193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847857A1] The alignment device (15) uses an opto-electrical device supported for axial movement relative to the surface of the printing machine cylinder via the sliding holder (3) coupled to the traverse (2) for supporting a measuring sensor device. The optoelectronic device provides a light beam directed onto the casing surface of the cylinder. The reflected beam is detected by an optical receiver device, including an optoelectronic sensor, and the resultant signal is evaluated electronically for determining the position of the traverse relative to the surface of the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0027 (2013.01); B41F 33/0063 (2013.01); B41F 33/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847857 A1 19980617; EP 0847857 B1 20010530; DE 19651193 A1 19980618; JP 2986770 B2 19991206; JP H10166556 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703668

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-12-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031204

2002-12-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703668 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB SE

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB SE

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI