Global Patent Index - EP 0847924 B1

EP 0847924 B1 2000-07-26 - Device for folding the narrow end side flaps of a foil wrapper of a cigarette block

Title (en)

Device for folding the narrow end side flaps of a foil wrapper of a cigarette block

Title (de)

Faltvorrichtung zum Einschlagen von schmalen Stirnseitenlappen einer Folienhülle eines Zigarettenblocks

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage pour rabattre les languettes d'extrémité des côtés minces d'une enveloppe d'un bloc de cigarettes

Publication

EP 0847924 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121033 A

Priority

DE 19651874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0847924A1] The device comprises a lifting platform (8) which supports the broad side of the block and communicating with the receiving pockets (3) of a rotary table. The support surface (12) cooperating with the folding members (18) forcing in the end face can be moved into the lifting path between the platform and the receiving pockets. Preferably, the support surface is in the form of a pivoting guide which can be swivelled into the lifting or transfer path. The folding members are preferably rotary beaters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 49/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847924 A1 19980617; EP 0847924 B1 20000726; CN 1087257 C 20020710; CN 1184755 A 19980617; DE 19651874 A1 19980618; ES 2149540 T3 20001101; HK 1010522 A1 20030307; JP H10297608 A 19981110; US 5819501 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2003-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030905

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TOPACK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149540 T3

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702078 20000831

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981127

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI