Global Patent Index - EP 0848079 B1

EP 0848079 B1 2000-03-15 - Method for depositing a protective coating with great efficiency against corrosion at high temperatures for superalloys, protective coating and pieces protected with such a coating

Title (en)

Method for depositing a protective coating with great efficiency against corrosion at high temperatures for superalloys, protective coating and pieces protected with such a coating

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schutzbeschichtung mit grosser Wirksamkeit gegen Hochtemperatur-Verschleiss von Superlegierungen, Schutzbeschichtung und damit beschichtete Teile

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un revêtement protecteur à haute efficacité contre la corrosion à haute température pour superalliages, revêtement protecteur obtenu par ce procédé et pièces protégées par ce revêtement

Publication

EP 0848079 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402999 A

Priority

FR 9615257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848079A1] A superalloy component is protected by forming on it a porous layer comprising a powdered alloy containing aluminium, chromium, an active ingredient, such as yttrium and rare earths of the yttric and lanthanidics groups. At least one platinum group metal, such as platinum, palladium, rhodium, ruthenium, osmium, iridium and alloys of these, is mixed with or applied on top of the layer and renders it impervious. Also claimed are a protective coating formed as above, in which the ingredients coexist throughout the thickness, and a superalloy component so coated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 10/58; C23C 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/50 (2006.01); C23C 10/28 (2006.01); C23C 10/58 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); C25D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 26/00 (2013.01); C23C 10/58 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12875 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12931 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12944 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848079 A1 19980617; EP 0848079 B1 20000315; CA 2228768 A1 19980612; CA 2228768 C 20050215; DE 69701442 D1 20000420; DE 69701442 T2 20000907; FR 2757181 A1 19980619; FR 2757181 B1 19990212; JP 3431474 B2 20030728; JP H10176283 A 19980630; US 6183888 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701442 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DEPOSITING A PROTECTIVE COATING WITH GREAT EFFICIENCY AGAINST CORROSION AT HIGH TEMPERATURES FOR SUPERALLOYS, PROTECTIVE COATING AND PIECES PROTECTED WITH SUCH A COATING

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DEPOSITING A PROTECTIVE COATING WITH GREAT EFFICIENCY AGAINST CORROSION AT HIGH TEMPERATURES FOR SUPERALLOYS, PROTECTIVE COATING AND PIECES PROTECTED WITH SUCH A COATING

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990322

1999-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI