Global Patent Index - EP 0848105 B1

EP 0848105 B1 2002-09-25 - Apparatus to measure distances in the zone of the headbox in a paper machine

Title (en)

Apparatus to measure distances in the zone of the headbox in a paper machine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Messung von Abständen im Bereich des Stoffauflaufes einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil pour mesurer des distances dans la zone de la caisse de tête d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0848105 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119141 A

Priority

AT 198596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848105A2] A method to measure the gaps between the lips in a stock inlet, at a papermaking machine comprises generating DC magnetic fields at the outlet gap. Their strengths are measured, to give the gap between the separate lips. Also claimed is an assembly with a magnetic field generator (10) at one of the two spaced lips (11) for a DC magnetic field. A magnetic field monitor (9), at the other lip (7,8), measures the field.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02; D21F 7/06; G01B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848105 A2 19980617; EP 0848105 A3 19990113; EP 0848105 B1 20020925; AT 404848 B 19990325; AT A198596 A 19980715; CA 2220838 A1 19980513; CN 1145012 C 20040407; CN 1183545 A 19980603; DE 59708318 D1 20021031; ES 2184018 T3 20030401; ID 19703 A 19980730; US 6221213 B1 20010424; ZA 9710179 B 19980528

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071103

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2006-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2005-11-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184018 T3

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708318 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS TO MEASURE DISTANCES IN THE ZONE OF THE HEADBOX IN A PAPER MACHINE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-01-20 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 1/02

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI