Global Patent Index - EP 0848117 B1

EP 0848117 B1 2003-06-04 - Anchor device for mounting on a support rail

Title (en)

Anchor device for mounting on a support rail

Title (de)

Verankerungseinheit zum Aufstecken auf eine Montageschiene

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ancrage à moteur sur un rail support

Publication

EP 0848117 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97120037 A

Priority

DE 19651151 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19651151C1] An anchoring unit is described for plugging onto a mounting rail with a retaining leg whose free edge has a projection engaging behind a support piece integrated with the anchoring unit after it has been plugged on. It has a retaining block, U-shaped in cross-section, whose side walls have slits open at the top for plugging onto the retaining leg. The support piece can be locked in with spring limbs (15) between the side walls and is provided with a support plate (14) running transversely to the side walls. The support plate edge projects obliquely into the slit opposite to the plug-in direction. The plate is supported with shoulders facing away from the edge by projections on the walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/18; E04B 9/06; F16B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/06 (2006.01); E04B 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/06 (2013.01); E04B 9/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651151 C1 19980129; AT 242376 T 20030615; EP 0848117 A2 19980617; EP 0848117 A3 19990609; EP 0848117 B1 20030604; ES 2200109 T3 20040301; TW 547579 U 20030811

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041116

2005-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051115

2004-11-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031115

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200109 T3

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-10-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-03-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990805

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI