Global Patent Index - EP 0848123 A3

EP 0848123 A3 2000-11-02 - A remote keyless entry system

Title (en)

A remote keyless entry system

Title (de)

Fernbedienbares schlüsselloses Eingangssystem

Title (fr)

Système télécommandé d'entrée sans clé

Publication

EP 0848123 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97117590 A

Priority

  • JP 31576697 A
  • US 72884496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848123A2] A road vehicle keyless entry system (10) having an in-vehicle communication processor (11) and a remote transponder (15) is provided. The communication processor (10) has a radio frequency received (12), a low frequency transmitter/receiver (13) and a controller (14) capable of encrypting and reading the signals sent and received by the low frequency transmitter/receiver (13). The transponder (15) has a radio frequency transmitter (16) that transmits a signal to the communication processor (11) upon receipt of a manual stimulus and a low frequency transmitter/receiver (17) capable of reading and responding to encrypted signals received from the communication processor (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; B60R 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); B60R 25/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/10 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/59 (2006.01); H04B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00357 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00396 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00412 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00492 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00507 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00777 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848123 A2 19980617; EP 0848123 A3 20001102; EP 0848123 B1 20041208; JP H11177464 A 19990702

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131010

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69731875

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69731875 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7B 60R 25/04 B

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE