Global Patent Index - EP 0848130 A3

EP 0848130 A3 2000-09-20 - Improved safe

Title (en)

Improved safe

Title (de)

Verbesserter Tresor

Title (fr)

Coffre-fort amélioré

Publication

EP 0848130 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97309855 A

Priority

GB 9625659 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848130A2] A safe (20) for an ATM comprises a layer of piezoelectric or pyroelectric material, and contains electrical circuitry (24) to sense a mechanical or thermal attack on the safe. The safe also contains response means such as a silent alarm (26) connected by radio to an external security centre; an audible alarm (28) and a dye spray (30). A neural network (22) is connected to the circuitry, and is trained to distinguish between different types of attack on the ATM (e.g. a casual kick or several hammer blows) and to activate the appropriate response means. Preferably said layer is polyvinylidene fluoride, which has both piezoelectric and pyroelectric properties. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/10; E05G 1/024; G07D 11/00; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/10 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/10 (2006.01); E05G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); E05G 1/10 (2013.01); G07D 11/0003 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01); G07F 19/207 (2013.01); E05G 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848130 A2 19980617; EP 0848130 A3 20000920; GB 2320349 A 19980617; GB 9625659 D0 19970129; JP H10246063 A 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05G 1/10 A, 7E 05G 1/024 B, 7G 07D 11/00 B, 7G 07F 7/10 B

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI