Global patent index - EP 0848207 A3

EP 0848207 A3 2000-11-15 - Once-through steam generator with a gas pass connected to a hot gas producing apparatus

Title (en)

Once-through steam generator with a gas pass connected to a hot gas producing apparatus

Title (de)

Durchlaufdampferzeuger mit einem Gaszug zum Anschliessen an eine Heissgas abgebende Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Générateur de vapeur à passage unique avec un passage de gaz raccordé à un appareil de production de gaz chaud

Publication

EP 0848207 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97122096 A

Priority

DE 19651936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848207A2] The gas flue (1) is for connecting to an appliance, especially gas turbine, supplying hot gas. A first condenser heating surface (13) has, in front of it on the flue gas outflow side, and after it on the steam side, a second condenser heating surface (14). Both heating surfaces are composed of pipes positioned in a horizontal gas-flue with the pipes (16,18,20,22,24,29,31,33) vertically positioned. The collectors (17,21) belonging to each condenser are joined by a connecting pipe (25) lying on a vertical plane. The two end parts of the connecting pipe are formed of chambers (17,21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/1815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848207 A2 19980617; EP 0848207 A3 20001115; DE 19651936 A1 19980702; DE 19651936 C2 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI