Global Patent Index - EP 0848313 A3

EP 0848313 A3 2001-02-07 - Accelerator pedal

Title (en)

Accelerator pedal

Title (de)

Fahrpedal

Title (fr)

Pédale d'accélération

Publication

EP 0848313 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97120604 A

Priority

DE 19652084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848313A2] The foot pedal (5) arm is mounted at the end of a compound lever (1) that is formed by a pair of leaf spring plates (3,4) that are embedded into a block (2) attached to the vehicle frame. Mounted on the lever are strain gauges (7) that provide a means of measuring the displacement. A third leaf spring (6) engages a stop (12) after a specific displacement and provides a kick down function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/14; B60K 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 26/02 (2006.01); G05G 1/38 (2008.04); G05G 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/38 (2013.01); G05G 5/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848313 A2 19980617; EP 0848313 A3 20010207; DE 19652084 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05G 1/14 A, 7B 60K 26/02 B

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI