Global patent index - EP 0848354 A3

EP 0848354 A3 2000-05-03 - Postage meter and postage indicia printed thereby

Title (en)

Postage meter and postage indicia printed thereby

Title (de)

Frankiermaschine und dadurch gedruckte Frankierzeichen

Title (fr)

Machine à affranchir et indices postaux ainsi imprimés

Publication

EP 0848354 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97309141 A

Priority

GB 9623936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2319217A] A postage meter includes a printer operated by electronic means to print postage indicia on mail items. In order to accommodate the required data within the postage indicium, data consisting of multi digits is represented by a lesser number of digits or by a single digit. The electronic means includes conversion means responsive to input of data, for example comprising postage amount and date, each consisting of multi digits which generates representations of that data consisting of a lesser number of digits or a single digit and the electronic means controls the printer to print the generated representation of the data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0058 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00943 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2319217 A 19980520; GB 2319217 B 20010725; GB 9623936 D0 19970108; EP 0848354 A2 19980617; EP 0848354 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20090618

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020408

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1998-06-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI