Global Patent Index - EP 0848760 B1

EP 0848760 B1 2000-08-09 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING CYLINDER LINERS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING CYLINDER LINERS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LAUFBUCHSEN FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE fABRICATION DE CHEMISES DE CYLINDRE POUR DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 0848760 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96930114 A

Priority

  • DE 19532253 A
  • EP 9603778 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19532253A1] A process is disclosed for manufacturing thin-walled pipes made of a heat- and wear-resistant aluminium-based material. A billet or tube blank made of a hypereutectic AlSi material is produced, optionally overaged by an annealing process, then extruded into a thick-walled pipe or round bar. The thus obtained preform is severed and extruded into a thin-walled pipe. This process is particularly suitable to manufacture light metal cylinder liners for internal combustion engines, since the thus manufactured cylinder liners have the required properties regarding wear-resistance, heat-resistance and lowered pollutant emissions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/043; B22F 3/115; C22C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/14 (2006.01); B21D 53/84 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/115 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/0416 (2013.01); B21C 23/183 (2013.01); B21C 23/186 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C23C 4/123 (2016.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19532253 A1 19970306; DE 19532253 C2 19980702; AT 195352 T 20000815; BR 9610377 A 19990706; CN 1066492 C 20010530; CN 1194013 A 19980923; DE 59605724 D1 20000914; DK 0848760 T3 20000925; EP 0848760 A1 19980624; EP 0848760 B1 20000809; ES 2151179 T3 20001216; GR 3034770 T3 20010228; JP 3582794 B2 20041027; JP H11501990 A 19990216; KR 100269898 B1 20001016; PT 848760 E 20010131; US 6086819 A 20000711; WO 9709457 A1 19970313

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605724

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130829

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-05-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130829

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-04-23 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000402459

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 195352 T

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-03-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-03-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERBSLOH A.G.

- Effective date: 20130831

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ERBSLOEH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ERBSLOEH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#SIEBENEICKER STRASSE 235#42553 VELBERT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ERBSLOEH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#SIEBENEICKER STRASSE 235#42553 VELBERT (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151179 T3

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-10-09 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605724 20000914

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195352 T 20000815

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-01-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING CYLINDER LINERS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980324

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE