Global Patent Index - EP 0848767 B1

EP 0848767 B1 2001-05-16 - CELLULOSE FIBRES WITH IMPROVED ELONGATION AT BREAK, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

CELLULOSE FIBRES WITH IMPROVED ELONGATION AT BREAK, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

CELLULOSEFASERN MIT HOHER BRUCHDEHNUNG UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES A ALLONGEMENT RUPTURE AMELIORE ET PROCEDES POUR LES OBTENIR

Publication

EP 0848767 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96927680 A

Priority

  • EP 9603444 W
  • FR 9509905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9706294A1] Cellulose formate fibre and a cellulose fibre regenerated from cellulose formate are disclosed. The fibres have high toughness and modulus properties combined with improved elongation at break and energy at break. Specifically, their elongation at break is higher than 6 %. Methods for producing said fibres are also disclosed. The cellulose formate fibre is produced by dry-jet-wet spinning a cellulose formate liquid-crystal solution followed by a coagulation step and a neutral washing step both performed in acetone. The regenerated cellulose fibre is produced by treating a cellulose formate fibre in an aqueous solution with a high soda concentration. The spinning and regenerating methods may be performed sequentially and continuously. Furthermore, reinforcing assemblies based on such fibres, and articles reinforced using said fibres or assemblies, particularly tyre casings, are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/28; C08L 1/10; D01F 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D01F 2/28 (2006.01); D02G 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D01F 2/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2965 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706294 A1 19970220; AT 201241 T 20010615; AU 6741996 A 19970305; AU 701914 B2 19990211; BR 9610076 A 19990302; CA 2226305 A1 19970220; CA 2226305 C 20040309; CN 1077614 C 20020109; CN 1198194 A 19981104; DE 69612863 D1 20010621; DE 69612863 T2 20010830; EP 0848767 A1 19980624; EP 0848767 B1 20010516; ES 2156619 T3 20010701; FR 2737735 A1 19970214; JP 2007084997 A 20070405; JP 3941836 B2 20070704; JP 4034808 B2 20080116; JP H11510569 A 19990914; RU 2169217 C2 20010620; US 6093490 A 20000725; US 6261689 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070805

2006-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156619 T3

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612863 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201241 T 20010615

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980310

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL