Global Patent Index - EP 0848774 B1

EP 0848774 B1 2001-04-11 - HALF-TIMBERING SYSTEM AND FRAMEWORK ELEMENTS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A FRAMEWORK ELEMENT

Title (en)

HALF-TIMBERING SYSTEM AND FRAMEWORK ELEMENTS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A FRAMEWORK ELEMENT

Title (de)

FACHWERK UND GEFACHEELEMENT UND VERFARHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEFACHEELEMENTS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONSTRUCTION A COLOMBAGES ET ELEMENTS DE CHARPENTE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CHARPENTE

Publication

EP 0848774 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939806 A

Priority

  • DE 9601649 W
  • DE 19532829 A
  • DE 19628043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6032434A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/01649 Sec. 371 Date May 8, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date May 8, 1998 PCT Filed Sep. 4, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/09492 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 13, 1997What is disclosed is a half-timber frame, compartment elements for a like half-timber frame, and a method for producing a compartment element, wherein boards of small-dimension timber are utilized for producing the half-timber frame supports as well as the compartment elements, such that a product which is considerably more economical than conventional solutions while having comparable thermal and acoustic insulation is obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/88; E04B 1/26; E04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2006.01); E04C 2/38 (2006.01); F24C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/386 (2013.01); E04B 1/26 (2013.01); E04B 5/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6032434 A 20000307; AT 200544 T 20010415; CA 2231350 A1 19970313; EP 0848774 A2 19980624; EP 0848774 B1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GRAF DRAGICA

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606782 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200544 T 20010415

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990409

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980304

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE