Global Patent Index - EP 0848917 B1

EP 0848917 B1 2000-04-19 - Blocking device

Title (en)

Blocking device

Title (de)

Blockiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Ensemble bloqueur

Publication

EP 0848917 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97121933 A

Priority

FR 9615817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848917A1] The guide (10) has a lug (11) for fastening to the boot, either by stitching or rivetting. It has a smooth guide section (20) for tensioning the lace (4), and a toothed section (30) for gripping the lace once it has been tensioned, set at right angles to the guide section. The two sections of the guide and stop lie in a single plane and in the same plane as the laced section of the boot. The guide section is bounded on one side by a straight wall (22) and on the other by a curved wall (23), while the teeth (34) of the gripping section are angled so that the lace is wedged between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/00 (2006.01); A43C 3/04 (2006.01); A43C 7/00 (2006.01); A43C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/04 (2013.01); A43C 3/00 (2013.01); A43C 7/00 (2013.01); A43C 7/08 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3724 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3918 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848917 A1 19980624; EP 0848917 B1 20000419; EP 0848917 B2 20040310; AT 191830 T 20000515; CA 2225605 A1 19980617; CA 2225605 C 20060718; CN 1184909 C 20050119; CN 1196209 A 19981021; DE 69701720 D1 20000525; DE 69701720 T2 20001026; DE 69701720 T3 20041028; ES 2144822 T3 20000616; ES 2144822 T5 20041101; FR 2757026 A1 19980619; FR 2757026 B1 19990226; HK 1016439 A1 20050729; TW 376306 B 19991211; US 5956823 A 19990928; US 6076241 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 191830 T

- Effective date: 20171212

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701720

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-24 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SALOMON S.A.S.

- Free text: SALOMON S.A.#LIEUDIT LA RAVOIRE#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SALOMON S.A.S.#LES CROISELETS#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR)

2009-12-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2008-06-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-11-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-08-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2004-06-30 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-05-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2004-03-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: K2 CORPORATION

2002-08-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: K2 CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20010119

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: K2 CORPORATION

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BAUER NIKE HOCKEY GMBH

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: K2 CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BAUER NIKE HOCKEY GMBH

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144822 T3

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701720 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191830 T 20000515

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980901

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI