Global Patent Index - EP 0848997 A3

EP 0848997 A3 2000-03-08 - Device for separating a mixture of materials, particularly building rubble

Title (en)

Device for separating a mixture of materials, particularly building rubble

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen einer Materialmischung, insbesondere einer Bauschuttmischung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer un mélange de matériaux notamment des gravats

Publication

EP 0848997 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121222 A

Priority

DE 19653328 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0848997A2] The separator includes a fluid supply device (4) provided in the transition area between a mixture supply device (1,2,3) and the separator. The heavy material parts (Y) of the mixture fall past the fluid supply device into the first part of the separator and an upwardly inclined fluid stream (X) is produced which carries away the lighter ingredients (Z) and other small-particled material such as sand washed out of the heavy ingredients towards the second part of the separating device. The fluid supply device comprises a series of pipes (5) which are shaped rectangular on an outlet side and are connected together directly to form a right angle so that a homogeneous fluid outlet surface is produced. The fluid supply device can be adjusted in angle and height.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03B 5/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 5/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03B 5/623 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0848997 A2 19980624; EP 0848997 A3 20000308; DE 19653328 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000805

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI