Global Patent Index - EP 0849045 B1

EP 0849045 B1 2000-10-25 - Toggle lever clamping device

Title (en)

Toggle lever clamping device

Title (de)

Kniehebelspannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage à genouillère

Publication

EP 0849045 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122025 A

Priority

DE 19652469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652469C1] The tool consists of a first linearly driven actuator (1), which is connected at its top end by a connection piece (6) to an intermediate link (2), and a second actuator (3), which is rotationally supported in a head piece (5) and is connected to the intermediate link. A dual functioning position sensor is immovably fitted to the head piece and is arranged opposite the connection piece. An adjustable positioning cam (8) is also arranged on the connection piece. A disengageable free standing trip catch (9), is arranged near the cam on the drive (1') side of the connection piece, to activate the sensor. An adjustable catch (10) is arranged on the drive side end of the trip catch, and trips the trip catch when the linearly driven actuator is in its end position. The trip catch is supported by parallel leaf springs and is mounted between two slots (12) using aligning pins (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12; B25B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/122 (2013.01); B25B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652469 C1 19980423; EP 0849045 A1 19980624; EP 0849045 B1 20001025; ES 2152618 T3 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081216

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152618 T3

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702523 20001130

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000330

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981121

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI