Global Patent Index - EP 0849047 B1

EP 0849047 B1 2000-10-25 - Toggle lever clamp with end position indicating device

Title (en)

Toggle lever clamp with end position indicating device

Title (de)

Kniehebelspannvorrichtung mit Einrichtung zur Endstellungsanzeige

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage à genouillère avec moyens de détection de fin de course

Publication

EP 0849047 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122027 A

Priority

DE 29631899 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849047A1] The device has a linearly guided actuating member (1) which is adjustable by a drive (5), an intermediate member (2) and a second actuating member (3). The second actuating member is provided to the clamping arm (4) and is rotatable in a head piece (6) with an articulated connection to the intermediate member. An intermediate piece (7) is positioned between the head piece and the drive, being detachably attached to them and passed through by the linear actuating member. It is provided with device fastening members (8), positioned outside the connection adaptations (A, A') to the head piece and drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12; B25B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/122 (2013.01); B25B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849047 A1 19980624; EP 0849047 B1 20001025; ES 2152620 T3 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161216

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702526

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE-STA-CO EUROPE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DE-STA-CO METALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH, 61449 STEINBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702526

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702526

- Representative's name: WOLF & WOLF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702526

- Representative's name: WOLF & WOLF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20141205

2014-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702526

- Representative's name: WOLF & WOLF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152620 T3

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702526 20001130

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981121

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI