Global Patent Index - EP 0849049 B1

EP 0849049 B1 2003-06-04 - Actuating tool with an angle measuring device for the tightening of threaded parts

Title (en)

Actuating tool with an angle measuring device for the tightening of threaded parts

Title (de)

Betätigungswerkzeug zum Anziehen von Schraubverbindungsteilen mit einer Winkelmesseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Outil de manoeuvre avec dispositif de mesure d'angles pour le serrage d'écrous

Publication

EP 0849049 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121580 A

Priority

DE 29622317 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849049A1] The operating tool (12) has an angle measuring unit, with an axis of rotation lying coaxial to the rotational axis of the operating tool, being connected with the lever arm of the operating tool, without a direct coupling with the screw connection part to be tightened up. The lever arm is coupled with the angle measuring unit, directly across a follower coupling. The angle measuring is applied at its lever arm, eccentrically to the axis of rotation of the operating tool. The operating tool has a follower head, located rotationally at the lever arm, engaging at the screw connection part. Also there is a tightening coupling (10), between the lever arm and the follower head, following only on a following rotational direction. The tightening coupling is arranged between the lever arm and the follower head. The follower coupling (28), between the lever arm and the angle measuring unit, is also a coupling which only moves in the follower direction of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/142 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/1422 (2013.01); B25B 23/1427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622317 U1 19971127; EP 0849049 A1 19980624; EP 0849049 B1 20030604; ES 2201241 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041209

2005-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-12-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201241 T3

2004-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710216 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991117

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI