Global Patent Index - EP 0849079 B1

EP 0849079 B1 2000-08-16 - Drying unit

Title (en)

Drying unit

Title (de)

Trocknereinheit

Title (fr)

Unité de séchage

Publication

EP 0849079 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97120532 A

Priority

DE 19651301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849079A1] The drying unit has a rectangular frame (114) supporting a number of heating rails (6,8), each having a main body provided by a section of an extruded hollow profile which is coupled to a heat source. The frame elements (122,124) extending parallel to the heating rails are provided by sections of the hollow profile used for the heating rails, which has ribs on the outside of the frame elements provided with air channels (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/04; F26B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/283 (2013.01); B41F 23/04 (2013.01); B41F 23/0436 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651301 A1 19980618; EP 0849079 A1 19980624; EP 0849079 B1 20000816; US 5991506 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702194

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2005-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702194 20000921

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-08-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990503

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI