Global Patent Index - EP 0849091 B1

EP 0849091 B1 2001-03-21 - Heat-sensitive imaging element for making lithographic printing plates comprising polymer particles with a specific particle size

Title (en)

Heat-sensitive imaging element for making lithographic printing plates comprising polymer particles with a specific particle size

Title (de)

Wärme-empfindliches Aufzeichnungselement zur Herstellung lithographischer Druckplatten, Polymerteilchen mit spezifischer Teilchengrössenverteilung enthaltend

Title (fr)

Elément sensible à la chaleur formateur d'image pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression lithographiques comprenant des particules de polymère avec une dimension de particule spécifique

Publication

EP 0849091 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96203633 A

Priority

EP 96203633 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849091A1] According to the present invention there is provided a heat-sensitive imaging element for making lithographic printing plates. The heat-sensitive imaging element comprises an image-forming layer comprising hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles having a specific particle size and polydispersity for obtaining printing plates with an improved sensitivity, excellent developability, high troughput and less scumming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/055 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849091 A1 19980624; EP 0849091 B1 20010321; DE 69612206 D1 20010426; DE 69612206 T2 20010920; JP 4036518 B2 20080123; JP H10186646 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161218

2017-01-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161218

2016-12-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612206

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS NV, BE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, US

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., PAKON INC., , US

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., PAKON INC., , US

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE; PAKON INC., MINNETONKA, MINN., US

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE; PAKON INC., MINNETONKA, MINN., US

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612206

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612206

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 69612206

- Effective date: 20120403

2010-08-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100722 AND 20100728

2010-07-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100401 AND 20100407

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612206 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000225

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981228

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB