Global Patent Index - EP 0849180 B1

EP 0849180 B1 2000-07-19 - Apparatus for packaging a roll of web material

Title (en)

Apparatus for packaging a roll of web material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken einer Materialbahnrolle

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour emballer un rouleau de matériau en bande

Publication

EP 0849180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121556 A

Priority

DE 19652450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849180A1] The material roll is wrapped using a standard width wrapping material wound round the roll in a spiral pattern. The wrapping extends over the ends of the roll enabling the surplus wrapping to be folded down onto the ends of the roll. This is done using separate presses (15,16) which press axially onto the roll. Each axial press is driven independent to the other. Each press has a sensor to monitor the wrapping overlap at the roll edges and to push same onto the end of the roll. The wrapping material can be paper which is folded over the ends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/148 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 1429445 A 19760324 - HUNT MOSCROP LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849180 A1 19980624; EP 0849180 B1 20000719; EP 0849180 B2 20041215; DE 19652450 A1 19980702; DE 19652450 C2 20000413; US 5943843 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091208

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-12 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2005-03-02 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2005-02-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-12-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-08-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-07-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SAIMATEC ENGINEERING OY

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAIMATEC ENGINEERING OY

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702049

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981019

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980328

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI