Global Patent Index - EP 0849205 A3

EP 0849205 A3 2000-03-15 - Method to control the under-pressure in the suction system of a textile machine

Title (en)

Method to control the under-pressure in the suction system of a textile machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln des Unterdrucks in einer Saugluftanlage einer Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour commander la dépression dans le système d'aspiration d'une machine textile

Publication

EP 0849205 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97120240 A

Priority

DE 19653617 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849205A2] A method of controlling the underpressure, in a suction system at a textile machine involves setting the suction power at a certain strength, and applying it after the start of a yarn batch, for the required working and basic requirements. The number of faults are counted which occur through a weak underpressure within a given time span, where their correction has been attempted without success. The suction power is then changed and, after a further time span, the faults of the type are counted and compared with the fault count in the previous time span. On a breach of a maximum preset fault count by the difference in the fault number, a high suction power is selected for an excess fault difference and a lower suction power is chosen for a fault difference count below the permitted level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/70; B65H 67/08; D01H 13/32; D01H 15/00; G05D 16/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 67/08 (2006.01); D01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/005 (2013.01); B65H 54/70 (2013.01); B65H 54/707 (2013.01); B65H 67/081 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849205 A2 19980624; EP 0849205 A3 20000315; EP 0849205 B1 20030502; DE 19653617 A1 19980625; ES 2193314 T3 20031101; JP H10194590 A 19980728; TR 9701595 A2 19980721; TR 9701595 A3 19980721; US 5934060 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071119

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W. *SCHLAFHORST A.G. & CO.

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193314 T3

2003-10-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709963 P 20030605

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI