Global Patent Index - EP 0849403 B1

EP 0849403 B1 2000-09-13 - Cutting wheel apparatus for excavating trenches

Title (en)

Cutting wheel apparatus for excavating trenches

Title (de)

Schlitzwandfräse

Title (fr)

Appareil excavateur à roues pour creuser des tranchées

Publication

EP 0849403 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119286 A

Priority

DE 19652835 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652835C1] The appliance has a machine frame with shield (11) and turnable cutter wheels (20a,b). At least one roller (26) is turnably fastened to each cutter wheel, with a roller axis (27) mainly radial to the rotary axis (21) of the wheel. A jacket surface of the roller on the end face (29) of the cutter wheel away from the shield, projects relative to it in direction of that rotary axis. Each roller has cutter tools, eg. truncated cone-shaped roller bits (22, 23). The appliance may have four cutter wheels, each with four roller bits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 17/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2006.01); E02F 3/20 (2006.01); E02F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/205 (2013.01); E02D 17/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652835 C1 19980326; AT 196336 T 20000915; CN 1070972 C 20010912; CN 1185508 A 19980624; EP 0849403 A1 19980624; EP 0849403 B1 20000913; HK 1010899 A1 20020412; ID 19690 A 19980730; JP 2971425 B2 19991108; JP H10183681 A 19980714; KR 100248603 B1 20000315; MY 120217 A 20050930; SG 77616 A1 20010116; TW 384334 B 20000311; US 5924222 A 19990720; ZA 9710949 B 19980615

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-05-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702343 20001019

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

2000-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196336 T 20000915

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR IT NL

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980904

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI