Global patent index - EP 0849419 B1

EP 0849419 B1 2000-10-11 - Set of prefabricated building elements for the construction of walls or floors of houses

Title (en)

Set of prefabricated building elements for the construction of walls or floors of houses

Title (de)

Satz vorgefertigter Bauelemente für die Herstellung der Wände und Decken von Häusern

Title (fr)

Série d'éléments de construction préfabriqués pour la construction de murs ou de plafonds de maisons

Publication

EP 0849419 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121910 A

Priority

DE 19653340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849419A1] The component set are made of concrete, e.g. standard concrete or porous concrete, of wood panels or brick walls, and are used for constructing walls and ceilings of houses. The set includes at least one basic member (6a) with edge lengths related to cross section corresponding to the thickness of wall or ceiling and additional basic members (6b-e) having the length of the basic member and thickness a whole-number multiple of this. At least one subsidiary member (7a, 8a, 9a) and at least one principal member (10a, 11a, 12a) have thickness corresponding to the edge length of the basic member and length a multiple of the edge length. Additional subsidiary members (7b-e, 8a-e, 9a-e)) and principal members (10b-e, 11b-e, 12b-e) have thickness which is a whole-number multiple of the subsidiary member thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849419 A1 19980624; EP 0849419 B1 20001011; AT 196939 T 20001015; DE 19653340 C1 19980903

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081212

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-02 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Opponent name: SCHMIDT-JUNGNITSCH WALTRAUD

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Opponent name: DRISKE HORST

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JUNGNITSCH REINER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHMIDT-JUNGNITSCH WALTRAUD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DRISKE HORST

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-04-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702451

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2000-10-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196939

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI