Global Patent Index - EP 0849626 B1

EP 0849626 B1 2001-05-23 - Colour photographic recording material with improved mechanical properties and improved stability in tropical climates

Title (en)

Colour photographic recording material with improved mechanical properties and improved stability in tropical climates

Title (de)

Farbfotografisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit verbesserten mechanischen Eigenschaften und verbesserter Tropenstabilität

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique couleur d'enregistrement ayant des propriétés mécaniques améliorées et une stabilité améliorée dans un climat tropical

Publication

EP 0849626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97121544 A

Priority

DE 19652956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849626A2] A colour negative photographic film with red-sensitive (RS), green-sensitive (GS) and blue-sensitive (BS) silver halide (AgX) emulsion units contains colourless cyan, magenta and yellow coupler(s) respectively and optionally other light-insensitive layers. The GS unit has NOTLESS 2 layers, the fastest of which is furthest from the film base, further from the base than the RS unit and nearer the base than the BS unit. The novelty is that the fastest GS layer contains organic yellow dye(s) (I) that can be bleached during processing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/83; G03C 7/392; G03C 7/30; G03C 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 1/83 (2006.01); G03C 7/20 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01); G03C 7/392 (2006.01); G03C 7/384 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/832 (2013.01); G03C 7/3029 (2013.01); G03C 7/384 (2013.01); G03C 2007/3034 (2013.01); G03C 2200/23 (2013.01); G03C 2200/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849626 A2 19980624; EP 0849626 A3 19990602; EP 0849626 B1 20010523; DE 19652956 A1 19980625; JP H10186600 A 19980714; US 5932402 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-19 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2004-10-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040921

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703591 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI