Global Patent Index - EP 0849631 B1

EP 0849631 B1 2002-11-06 - Exposure mask for producing color filter, and method and apparatus for producing color filter

Title (en)

Exposure mask for producing color filter, and method and apparatus for producing color filter

Title (de)

Belichtungsmaske zur Herstellung von Farbfiltern und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Farbfiltern

Title (fr)

Masque à l'exposition pour la production de filtres colorés et méthode et dispositif de production de filtres colorés

Publication

EP 0849631 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97310230 A

Priority

JP 33737196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849631A1] A color filter (49, 55) has blue, green and red pixel patterns (50-52, 56-58) and a black matrix (53, 59). To produce the color filter from silver halide photosensitive film (10), an exposure mask (22, 83) is used. The exposure mask includes a first group (40, 90) of light-transmitting slits adapted to exposure of the blue pixel pattern. A second group (41, 91) of light-transmitting slits are adapted to exposure of the green pixel pattern. A third group (42, 92) of light-transmitting slits are adapted to exposure of the red pixel pattern. A fourth group (43, 93) of light-transmitting slits are adapted to exposure of the black matrix. First to third auxiliary filters (36, 45-47) respectively cover the first to third groups of the light-transmitting slits. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/12; G02F 1/1335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/00 (2006.01); G02B 5/20 (2006.01); G03B 27/02 (2006.01); G03C 5/08 (2006.01); G03C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849631 A1 19980624; EP 0849631 B1 20021106; DE 69716863 D1 20021212; DE 69716863 T2 20030327; JP H10177240 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69716863

- Effective date: 20130702

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716863 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03C 7/12 A, 7G 02F 1/1335 B

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010713

1999-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

1999-03-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981020

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI