Global patent index - EP 0849744 B1

EP 0849744 B1 2000-05-10 - Insulating film and method for preparing the same

Title (en)

Insulating film and method for preparing the same

Title (de)

Isolationsschicht und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Film isolant et méthode pour le fabriquer

Publication

EP 0849744 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97121155 A

Priority

JP 33975696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849744A2] An electrically insulating film capable of maintaining a preferable insulating property even with a film thickness of only some mu m and a method for preparing the same are disclosed. The insulating film comprises a first layer formed on a surface of a conductor substrate of a transition metal and comprised of molecules fixed on the surface of the conductor substrate through chemical bonds such as transition metal-sulfur bonds or chelate bonds, and a second layer formed on the first layer and comprised of a resin bonded to the molecules of the first layer through covalent bonds. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/30; B05D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/02 (2006.01); H01B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/30 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31529 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31533 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31536 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31605 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31681 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31692 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31855 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31909 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849744 A2 19980624; EP 0849744 A3 19981028; EP 0849744 B1 20000510; DE 69701952 D1 20000615; DE 69701952 T2 20001019; JP H10175265 A 19980630; US 6203919 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071202

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971202

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI