Global Patent Index - EP 0849757 A3

EP 0849757 A3 2000-12-20 - Housing for an electrical installation device, in particular for a fault-current protective switch or a circuit breaker or the like

Title (en)

Housing for an electrical installation device, in particular for a fault-current protective switch or a circuit breaker or the like

Title (de)

Gehäuse für ein elektrisches Installationsgerät, insbesondere für einen Leitungsschutzschalter oder Fehlerstromschutzschalter oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour un appareil d'installation électrique, en particulier pour un disjoncteur de courant de fuite ou un disjoncteur de protection ou similaires

Publication

EP 0849757 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121380 A

Priority

DE 19653300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849757A2] The housing has two housing shell elements which have opposing free edges at which they are joined together. The front side (17,18) is covered by a covering cap (28). The housing has an approximately T-shaped outer contour with a longitudinal rib (17) connected to a transverse rib parallel to the base surface. One free end of the longitudinal rib forming a sub-section of the front wall (18) is at least partially covered by the covering cap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/02; H01H 71/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/06 (2013.01); H01H 71/02 (2013.01); H01H 2071/0242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849757 A2 19980624; EP 0849757 A3 20001220; DE 19653300 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050218

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI