Global patent index - EP 0849758 A3

EP 0849758 A3 2000-12-20 - Installation switch

Title (en)

Installation switch

Title (de)

Installationsschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur d'installation

Publication

EP 0849758 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121386 A

Priority

DE 19653378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849758A2] The switch has a housing (10,50) in which the individual components, e.g. a summing current transducer, electromagnetic trigger, thermal trigger, etc., are integrated. The housing has a cup-shaped lower part and a cap-shaped upper part and at least two chambers. The chambers are separated from each other by separating walls (51-53) set into the lower housing part. An aperture in the underside of the base of the lower housing part is used to snap the housing to a carrier rail. Protrusions forming holders for connectors are formed in inner side walls parallel to the aperture . A connector holder chamber is formed between each two protrusions and an end wall perpendicular to the aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/02; H01H 71/08; H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/0214 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849758 A2 19980624; EP 0849758 A3 20001220; DE 19653378 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040702

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 71/02 A, 7H 01H 71/08 B, 7H 01H 71/10 B

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI