Global Patent Index - EP 0849826 A3

EP 0849826 A3 2000-02-23 - Terminal for electric conductor

Title (en)

Terminal for electric conductor

Title (de)

Verbindungsklemme für elektr. Leiter

Title (fr)

Borne pour conducteur électronique

Publication

EP 0849826 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119218 A

Priority

DE 19654523 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0849826A2] The connection clamp has an insulating housing containing a metallic contact device with at least 2 clamp points, provided by a current rail rod (3) and a one-piece spring steel plate (4), with a number of stamped out spring tongues (5). The latter are positioned in mirror-symmetry to the centre plane (7) of the spring steel plate, with a clamp edge lying in contact with the current rail rod at the end of each tongue, for securing an inserted conductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/70 (2013.01); H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0849826 A2 19980624; EP 0849826 A3 20000223; EP 0849826 B1 20030226; AT 233437 T 20030315; BR 9706399 A 19990914; CN 1096722 C 20021218; CN 1185669 A 19980624; CZ 290430 B6 20020717; CZ 9704047 A3 19980715; DE 19654523 A1 19980702; DE 19654523 C2 20031009; ES 2193312 T3 20031101; JP 4009975 B2 20071121; JP H10223275 A 19980821; PL 190288 B1 20051130; PL 323814 A1 19980622; RU 2195752 C2 20021227; TW 385577 B 20000321; US 6132238 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59709394

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-08-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59709394

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WAGO VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193312 T3

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709394 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR SE

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011205

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR SE

1998-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI