Global Patent Index - EP 0850057 A4

EP 0850057 A4 2001-04-11 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES PHARMACEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 0850057 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96929780 A

Priority

  • US 9613855 W
  • US 293595 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708334A1] Methods for producing cryptophycin compounds by bacterial fermentation are disclosed, together with novel compositions produced thereby.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/395; C07D 273/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 273/00 (2006.01); C07D 273/08 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 273/00 (2013.01); C12P 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 4845086 A 19890704 - SESIN DAVID F [US]
  • [E] WO 9639829 A1 19961219 - UNIV HAWAII [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9640184 A1 19961219 - UNIV HAWAII [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9708334 A1 19970306 - UNIV HAWAII [US], et al
  • [XY] BARROW, RUSSELL A. ET AL: "Total Synthesis of Cryptophycins. Revision of the Structures of Cryptophycins A and C", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (1995), 117(9), 2479-90, XP002066281
  • [XY] TRIMURTULU, GOLAKOTI ET AL: "Total Structures of Cryptophycins, Potent Antitumor Depsipeptides from th Blue-Green Alga Nostoc sp. Strain GSV 224", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (1994), 116(11), 4729-37, XP002159594
  • [XY] KOBAYASHI, MOTOMASA ET AL: "The absolute stereostructure of arenastatin A, a potent cytotoxic depsipeptide from the Okinawan marine sponge Dysidea arenaria", CHEM. PHARM. BULL. (1994), 42(10), 2196-8, XP002159595
  • See also references of WO 9707798A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708334 A1 19970306; AU 6904896 A 19970319; AU 709828 B2 19990909; AU 7109096 A 19970319; BR 9610214 A 19990615; CA 2230540 A1 19970306; CA 2246117 A1 19970306; EP 0850057 A1 19980701; EP 0850057 A4 20010411; EP 0850316 A1 19980701; EP 0850316 A4 20000823; JP 2000501067 A 20000202; JP 2000507805 A 20000627; WO 9707798 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF HAWAII

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980226

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE