Global Patent Index - EP 0850089 A4

EP 0850089 A4 2000-04-12 - INTRASTROMAL PHOTO-REFRACTIVE KERATECTOMY

Title (en)

INTRASTROMAL PHOTO-REFRACTIVE KERATECTOMY

Title (de)

FOTO-REFRAKTIVE, INTRASTROMALE KERATEKTOMIE

Title (fr)

KERATOTOMIE PAR PHOTO-REFRACTION INTRASTROMALE

Publication

EP 0850089 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96928030 A

Priority

  • CA 2226949 A
  • US 9612556 W
  • US 51658195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9706856A1] A method for performing intrastromal photo-refractive keratectomy in the cornea (12) of an eye using a pulsed laser beam, includes the initial step of focusing the beam to a focal spot at a selected starting point in the stroma (22). The starting point is located at a predetermined distance behind the epithelium (18) of the cornea. While focused on the starting point, the laser beam is pulsed to disrupt a volume of stromal tissue (36) which is substantially equal to the volume of the focal spot. Subsequently, the beam is focused in a patterned sequence to focal spots at other discrete points in the stroma. At each point the stromal tissue is photo-disrupted. With this progressive pattern of photo-disruption, each spot is placed substantially adjacent a volume of previously disrupted tissue. The resultant photo-disrupted tissue creates a layer which is substantially centro-symmetrical around the optical axis. A plurality of layers can be removed to create a cavity in the stroma. When the cavity collapses, the corneal curvature is changed as desired.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 5/02; A61F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/20 (2006.01); A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61F 9/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/008 (2013.01); A61F 9/00827 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00872 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00897 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706856 A1 19970227; CA 2226949 A1 19990816; CA 2226949 C 20090505; EP 0850089 A1 19980701; EP 0850089 A4 20000412; JP H11511051 A 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61N 5/02 A, 7A 61F 9/00 B

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUHASZ, TIBOR

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BILLE, JOSEF, F.

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980317

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB