Global patent index - EP 0850112 B1

EP 0850112 B1 2001-01-10 - DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE DIGITAL IMAGE DATA ARISING ON THE SCANNING OF LOOSE ITEMS ON A CONVEYOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE DIGITAL IMAGE DATA ARISING ON THE SCANNING OF LOOSE ITEMS ON A CONVEYOR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUKTION DER BEI ABTASTUNG VON STÜCKGÜTERN AUF EINER FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG ANFALLENDEN DIGITALEN BILDDATEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REDUCTION DES DONNEES VIDEO NUMERIQUES OBTENUES LORS DU BALAYAGE D'OBJETS PLACES SUR UN TRANSPORTEUR

Publication

EP 0850112 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937986 A

Priority

  • DE 9601630 W
  • DE 19532758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709133A1] The device contains a conveyor with at least one conveyor belt (3, 7, 11, 15) for loose items (25), the surface of which has a brightness which is as complementary as possible to that of the surfaces of fixed regions (1, 5, 9, 13, 17) visible near it and an electronic scanning device (ZK, L1, L2) extending approximately transversely (X) to the conveying direction (Y) over the width of the conveyor belt and the visible surfaces of the fixed regions for the linear detection of the brightnesses (I(x,y)). There is also a program-controlled computer (PC) which stores a sequence of the brightnesses (I(x)) occurring over the width (X) of the conveyor belt (3,...) and visible surfaces of the fixed regions (1,...) in the absence of a loose item (25) in a first store (SP1) and places current brightnesses (I(x,y)*) in a second store (SP2) as long as differences occur on the comparison with the corresponding values or values from the stored sequence (I(x)).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/14 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709133 A1 19970313; EP 0850112 A1 19980701; EP 0850112 B1 20010110; JP H11512023 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606320

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000526

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR