Global Patent Index - EP 0850114 B1

EP 0850114 B1 2000-08-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PRESSURE-ROLLED PIPES WITH THICKENED INNER WALL SECTIONS AT THE ENDS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PRESSURE-ROLLED PIPES WITH THICKENED INNER WALL SECTIONS AT THE ENDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DRÜCKGEWALZTEN ROHREN MIT INNEREN WANDVERDICKUNGEN AN DEN ENDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES TUYAUX FLUOTOURNES, A EXTREMITES A PAROIS INTERIEURES EPAISSIES

Publication

EP 0850114 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931011 A

Priority

  • DE 19532951 A
  • EP 9603870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19532951A1] The invention concerns a method of producing pressure-rolled pipes (3) with a pressure mandrel (1) and one or a plurality of pressure rollers (2), the pipe (3) being disposed between the pressure mandrel (1) and the pressure rollers (2) and being plastically deformed by the force applied by the pressure rollers (2). In order to produce pipes with thickened wall sections at the ends, according to the invention, a first pressure mandrel (1a) with a stepped portion (4) at the tailstock end is used in a first operating step. The pressure rollers (2) commence their deforming action at the stepped portion (4) at the tailstock end, operating in the direction of the machine spindle. The semi-finished pipe (3a) is then removed from the first pressure mandrel (1a). In a second operating step, at the end where a thickened wall section (5) has already been produced, the semi-finished pipe (3a) is clamped in a rotary chuck (6) (clamping mandrel or the like) mounted in the pressure roller machine. A second pressure mandrel (1b), which is secured at the tailstock end and has an outer diameter (d2) corresponding to the inner diameter of the thickened wall section, is inserted into the semi-finished pipe (3a). The pressure rollers (2) then shape the second thickened wall section from the tailstock end towards the machine spindle side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/20 (2006.01); B21D 22/16 (2006.01); B21H 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/20 (2013.01); B21D 22/16 (2013.01); B21H 7/187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19532951 A1 19970313; AT 195274 T 20000815; CA 2228570 A1 19970313; CN 1195306 A 19981007; CZ 9800480 A3 19990512; EP 0850114 A1 19980701; EP 0850114 B1 20000809; JP H11512028 A 19991019; MX 9801793 A 19980830; US 6038901 A 20000321; WO 9709135 A1 19970313

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050904

2003-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-06-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DYNAMIT NOBEL G.M.B.H. EXPLOSIVSTOFF- UND SYSTEMT

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605725 20000914

2000-09-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195274 T 20000815

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYNAMIT NOBEL GMBH EXPLOSIVSTOFF- UND SYSTEMTECHNI

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE